Global Patent Index - EP 1035754 A3

EP 1035754 A3 2001-12-05 - Signalling device with a light emitting diode

Title (en)

Signalling device with a light emitting diode

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Anzeigen einer Meldung mit einer Leuchtdiode

Title (fr)

Dispositif de signalisation à diode électroluminescente

Publication

EP 1035754 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00104197 A

Priority

DE 19909950 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1035754A2] The device has a light emitting diode and a control unit that controls its operating current. The control unit repeatedly and temporarily raises the light emitting diode's operating current (IN) above the usual level of the operating current in order to increase the signaling effect of the warning.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 33/08; G09G 3/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/0818 (2013.01); H05B 33/0848 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909950 A1 20000907; AT 405135 T 20080815; DE 50015302 D1 20080925; EP 1035754 A2 20000913; EP 1035754 A3 20011205; EP 1035754 B1 20080813

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090301

2009-07-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090514

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080813

2008-12-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015302 P 20080925

2008-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL SE

2008-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020712

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020218

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI