Global Patent Index - EP 1035755 A2

EP 1035755 A2 2000-09-13 - Method for installing the electrical operating means of a lighting system

Title (en)

Method for installing the electrical operating means of a lighting system

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Inbetriebnahme der elektrischen Betriebsmittel eines Beleuchtungssystems

Title (fr)

Méthode de mise en service des moyens de commande d'un système d'éclairage

Publication

EP 1035755 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103678 A

Priority

DE 19909646 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves activating a lighting system having several drive devices (B1-B6) to drive lamps (LP1-LP8) inserted in electric lights (L1-L6), and at least one programmable control unit (St) to control the drive devices. During the activation phase, addresses are assigned to the drive devices through the control device. The address assignment involves applying the supply voltage to the drive devices. A control command to initiate the address assignment is sent from the control unit to the drive devices to be controlled. The drive device to be controlled is selected by interrupting and re-establishing the electrical contact to a lamp of the drive device. The contact interruption is reported to the control unit. An address is transferred from an address supply of the control unit to the selected drive device and is stored in a memory of the drive device. The process is repeated for the remaining lights, which have drive devices that are to be controlled by the control unit and to which addresses are to be assigned.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Inbetriebnahmeverfahren für ein Beleuchtungssystems, das mehrere mit Lampen (LP1; LP2; LP3; LP4, LP5; LP6; LP7, LP8) und elektrische Betriebsmittel zum Betreiben dieser Lampen bestückte Leuchten (L1; L2; L3; L4; L5; L6), eine Steuerungseinrichtung (St) zur Ansteuerung der elektrischen Betriebsmittel (B1; B2; B3; B4; B5; B6) und Bedienungselemente (S) zur Bedienung und Programmierung der Steuerungseinrichtung (St) aufweist. Während der Inbetriebnahmephase des Beleuchtungssystems wird eine Initialisierung des Systems durchgeführt, bei der jedem elektrischen Betriebsmittel (B1; B2; B3; B4; B5; B6) eine individuelle Geräteadresse zugewiesen wird, die die Identifizierung des Betriebsmittels (B1; B2; B3; B4; B5; B6) beziehungsweise der Leuchte (L1; L2; L3; L4; L5; L6) durch die Steuerungseinrichtung (St) gewährleistet. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Übernähme der dem Betriebsmittel (B1; B2; B3; B4; B5; B6) von der Steuerungseinrichtung (St) zugewiesenen individuellen Adresse durch eine kurzzeitige Unterbrechung des elektrischen Kontaktes zu einer der Lampen (LP1; LP2; LP3; LP4, LP5; LP6; LP7, LP8) dieses elektrischen Betriebsmittels (B1; B2; B3; B4; B5; B6) bewirkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/02 (2013.01); H05B 37/0263 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909646 A1 20000907; AT 287630 T 20050215; CA 2299863 A1 20000905; CA 2299863 C 20081209; EP 1035755 A2 20000913; EP 1035755 A3 20020313; EP 1035755 B1 20050119; ES 2234463 T3 20050701; JP 2000260574 A 20000922; JP 4436522 B2 20100324; US 6404143 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50009249

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50009249

- Effective date: 20130205

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120222

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-01-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50009249

- Effective date: 20111128

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110222

2011-05-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110501

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050619

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PATENT-TREUHAND-GESELLSCHAFT FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHL

- Effective date: 20050228

2006-01-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-11-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PATENT-TREUHAND-GESELLSCHAFT FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHL

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-08-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2234463 T3

2005-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-05-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-04-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-04-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050319

2005-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009249 P 20050224

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-02-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-02-22 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-02-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050119

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030214

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020408

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI