Global patent index - EP 1035784 A1

EP 1035784 A1 2000-09-20 - CONTACT LENS STORAGE CONTAINER

Title (en)

CONTACT LENS STORAGE CONTAINER

Title (de)

BEHÄLTER ZUM BEWAHREN VON KONTAKTLINSEN

Title (fr)

CONTENANT DE STOCKAGE POUR LENTILLE DE CONTACT

Publication

EP 1035784 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98962398 A

Priority

  • EP 9807675 W
  • US 98100097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9927813A1] A container (10) is provided for storing a contact lens (1) in a liquid, the contact lens having a base surface (52) defining a base curve equivalent radius (54) and a front surface (50). The container includes a base portion (14) and a bowl portion (16) formed integral with the base portion for containing the liquid and the contact lens. The bowl portion includes a lens seating section (38) having an inner surface defined by a radius (42) sized from slightly larger than to equal to the base curve equivalent radius so that the front surface of the contact lens removably adheres to the inner surface. The base curve equivalent radius may be from about 85 % to about 100 % of the inner surface radius, and the inner surface radius may be about 9.0 mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 11/00; B65D 75/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/04 (2006.01); B65D 75/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/32 (2013.01); B65D 2585/545 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927813A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9927813 A1 19990610; AR 014045 A1 20010131; AU 1757699 A 19990616; EP 1035784 A1 20000920; JP 2001524334 A 20011204; ZA 9810922 B 19990601

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021231

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS-ERFINDUNGEN VERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT M.B.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000410

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE