Global Patent Index - EP 1035829 A1

EP 1035829 A1 2000-09-20 - USE OF A DIPHENYLDIMETHICONE DISSOLVED IN A NON-VOLATILE SILICONE SUCH AS PHENYLTRIMETHICONE FOR MAKING A COSMETIC OR PHARMACEUTICAL, IN PARTICULAR DERMATOLOGICAL, COMPOSITION COMPRISING A FATTY PHASE

Title (en)

USE OF A DIPHENYLDIMETHICONE DISSOLVED IN A NON-VOLATILE SILICONE SUCH AS PHENYLTRIMETHICONE FOR MAKING A COSMETIC OR PHARMACEUTICAL, IN PARTICULAR DERMATOLOGICAL, COMPOSITION COMPRISING A FATTY PHASE

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG EINES DIPHENYLDIMETHICONGUMMIS GELÖSST IN EINEM NICHTFLÜCHTIGEN SILIKON DES PHENYLTRIMETHICONTYPS ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EINEM KOSMETISCHEN ODER PHARMAZEUTISCHEN , INSBESONDERE DERMATOLOGISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DIE EINE FETTPHASE ENTHÄLT

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE GOMME DE DIPHENYLDIMETHICONE DISSOUTE DANS UNE SILICONE NON VOLATILE DE TYPE PHENYLTRIMETHICONE POUR LA FABRICATION D'UNE COMPOSITION COSMETIQUE OU PHARMACEUTIQUE, NOTAMMENT DERMATOLOGIQUE COMPRENANT UNE PHASE GRASSE

Publication

EP 1035829 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98958300 A

Priority

  • FR 9802591 W
  • FR 9715177 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2771628A1] The invention concerns a silicone gum, more particularly the use of a silicone gum such as diphenyldimethicone dissolved in a silicone oil such as phenyltrimethicone for making a cosmetic or pharmaceutical, in particular dermatological, composition containing a fatty phase. The invention enables the preparation of cosmetic or pharmaceutical compositions for skin care, in particular for the face or the body or for hair care.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/48; A61K 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/29 (2006.01); A61K 8/31 (2006.01); A61K 8/35 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/39 (2006.01); A61K 8/72 (2006.01); A61K 8/73 (2006.01); A61K 8/81 (2006.01); A61K 8/89 (2006.01); A61K 8/891 (2006.01); A61K 8/92 (2006.01); A61K 8/97 (2006.01); A61Q 1/00 (2006.01); A61Q 1/02 (2006.01); A61Q 1/04 (2006.01); A61Q 1/06 (2006.01); A61Q 1/12 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); C08L 83/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/922 (2013.01); A61K 8/37 (2013.01); A61K 8/375 (2013.01); A61K 8/732 (2013.01); A61K 8/891 (2013.01); A61Q 1/02 (2013.01); A61Q 1/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927903A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2771628 A1 19990604; FR 2771628 B1 20000713; AT 217521 T 20020615; AU 1439199 A 19990616; DE 69805435 D1 20020620; DE 69805435 T2 20030109; EP 1035829 A1 20000920; EP 1035829 B1 20020515; ES 2177098 T3 20021201; JP 2001524507 A 20011204; US 6592855 B1 20030715; WO 9927903 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2005-12-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051202

2005-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031203

2004-12-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031202

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-12-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-07-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PARFUMS CHRISTIAN *DIOR

- Effective date: 20021231

2003-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-01-08 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1035829E

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021211

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021209

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021202

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177098 T3

2002-11-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021126

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-08-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020816

2002-08-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020816

2002-08-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020815

2002-08-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020815

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-06-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69805435 20020620

2002-06-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-05-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-05-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-05-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-05-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217521 T 20020615

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE