Global Patent Index - EP 1035869 A1

EP 1035869 A1 2000-09-20 - CHEMICALLY AND THERMALLY STABLE NORASTEMIZOLE FORMULATIONS

Title (en)

CHEMICALLY AND THERMALLY STABLE NORASTEMIZOLE FORMULATIONS

Title (de)

CHEMISCH UND THERMISCH STABILE NORASTEMIZOL FORMULIERUNGEN

Title (fr)

FORMULATIONS CHIMIQUEMENT ET THERMIQUEMENT STABLES DE NORASTEMIZOLE

Publication

EP 1035869 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98914283 A

Priority

  • US 9805701 W
  • US 82447797 A
  • US 85178697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842379A2] The present invention relates to chemically and thermally stable pharmaceutical formulations of the potent antihistamine, norastemizole. The compositions are lactose-free, non-hygroscopic, or anhydrous, or comprise large particles or inertly coated norastemizole, or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof, and are stable and easily manufactured.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/16 (2006.01); A61K 9/20 (2006.01); A61K 9/48 (2006.01); A61K 31/4168 (2006.01); A61K 31/4184 (2006.01); A61K 31/4188 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/4468 (2006.01); A61K 31/454 (2006.01); A61K 31/4545 (2006.01); A61K 47/00 (2006.01); A61K 47/12 (2006.01); A61K 47/26 (2006.01); A61K 47/36 (2006.01); A61K 47/38 (2006.01); A61K 47/46 (2006.01); A61P 27/16 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A61K (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/4866 (2013.01); A61K 9/2054 (2013.01); A61K 9/2059 (2013.01); A61K 9/4858 (2013.01); A61K 31/454 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842379A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842379 A2 19981001; WO 9842379 A3 20010301; AR 012187 A1 20000927; AU 6868098 A 19981020; AU 735257 B2 20010705; BR 9808428 A 20000523; CA 2284705 A1 19981001; CN 1257431 A 20000621; EP 1035869 A1 20000920; HU 0001823 A2 20010428; HU 0001823 A3 20020429; JP 2002512614 A 20020423; NO 994655 A 19991115; NO 994655 D0 19990924; NZ 517472 A 20030829; NZ 527200 A 20041224; NZ 527201 A 20041224; RU 2214245 C2 20031020; ZA 9802562 B 19981001

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050420

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030515

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEPRACOR INC.

2001-05-09 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2001-05-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/445 A, 7A 61K 9/20 B

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991015

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE