Global Patent Index - EP 1035956 A1

EP 1035956 A1 2000-09-20 - SURFACING DEVICE

Title (en)

SURFACING DEVICE

Title (de)

BESCHICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SURFA AGE

Publication

EP 1035956 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99946259 A

Priority

  • FR 9902313 W
  • FR 9812138 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2783963A1] The invention concerns a device comprising a mobile assembly (24) designed to be placed in an operational position wherein said assembly (24) is above the opening (12e) of a container (12) filled with a viscous material, first driving means (32) and a first guiding system (30a, 34a, 42) ensuring a vertical translation motion of said assembly (24) relative to said container (12), and second driving means (48) with variable speed and a second guiding system (54), ensuring a rotating motion of a mobile sub-assembly (26) pertaining to said assembly (24). Said sub-assembly (26) comprises a vertical shaft whereof the top part (46a) is integral with said second driving means (48) and a smoothing board (22) coupled with the lower part (46b) of said shaft which has a length substantially equal to the radius of said opening (12e) and a lower surface with a horizontal longitudinal portion for levelling the viscous material top surface (14a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 1/29; E04F 21/24; G21F 9/00; G21F 9/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/02 (2006.01); B28B 1/29 (2006.01); E04F 21/24 (2006.01); G21F 9/00 (2006.01); G21F 9/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21F 9/008 (2013.01); B28B 1/29 (2013.01); E04F 21/24 (2013.01); G21F 9/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0018553A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2783963 A1 20000331; FR 2783963 B1 20001215; DE 69912922 D1 20031224; DE 69912922 T2 20040902; EP 1035956 A1 20000920; EP 1035956 B1 20031119; JP 2002525218 A 20020813; JP 4495345 B2 20100707; RU 2235639 C2 20040910; US 6548007 B1 20030415; WO 0018553 A1 20000406

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160718

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69912922

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140911

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070401

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2006-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2005-09-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050908

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050818

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-02-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-02-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69912922 P 20031224

2003-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020614

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE