Global Patent Index - EP 1035965 A1

EP 1035965 A1 2000-09-20 - V-BELT DRIVE

Title (en)

V-BELT DRIVE

Title (de)

KEILTRIEB

Title (fr)

TRANSMISSION PAR COURROIE TRAPEZOIDALE

Publication

EP 1035965 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945183 A

Priority

  • DE 19753549 A
  • EP 9805034 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19753549A1] The aim of the object is a v-belt drive for diverting a vertical pressure force comprising a driver (1), a slider (2) and a slider accommodator (3), characterised in that the driver (1) has a prismatic guide (13), the travel path Y of the slider (2) on the driver (1) is smaller than the travel path X of the slider (2) on the slider accommodator (3) and the angle alpha between Y and X is 45-70 DEG .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 1/40; B21D 28/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/32 (2006.01); B30B 1/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928117A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19753549 A1 19990617; DE 19753549 C2 20000217; EP 1035965 A1 20000920; EP 1035965 B1 20030305; WO 9928117 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100808

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100808

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090819

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-09-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-03-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090212 AND 20090218

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-11-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010607

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT