Global Patent Index - EP 1035966 A1

EP 1035966 A1 2000-09-20 - DEVICE FOR SEPARATING LINES OF MATERIAL WHICH ARE ARRANGED ON TOP OF EACH OTHER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR SEPARATING LINES OF MATERIAL WHICH ARE ARRANGED ON TOP OF EACH OTHER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR TRENNUNG ÜBEREINANDERLIEGENDER MATERIALBAHNEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SEPARER DES BANDES DE MATERIAU SUPERPOSEES

Publication

EP 1035966 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99947079 A

Priority

  • AT 9900236 W
  • AT 165898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0020193A1] The invention relates to a device for separating two lines of material which are arranged on top of each other. The lines of material are to be separated whilst they are being transported on a conveying device, the first of the lines of material being detachably fixed to the conveying device. The inventive device comprises a suction device (8, 9), which is moveable in relation to the second line of material and by which means it is able to temporarily draw the second material by suction and separate it from the first line of material. The device also has two cranks (10, 13) which are set apart and which each rotate about a first pivot pin (10a, 13a) and are each rotationally connected to the suction device (8) by a second pivot pin (10b,13b). The inventive device is characterised by a drive device with a peripheral engaging element which is connected to an engaging element configured on one of the cranks. The paths of revolution of the drive device engaging element and the crank engaging element do not coincide and are non-parallel and the engaging elements engage with each other in such a way that they can be displaced in relation to each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 1/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/80 (2006.01); B65H 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 41/00 (2013.01); B31B 50/80 (2017.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0020193 A1 20000413; AT 407236 B 20010125; AT A165898 A 20000615; AU 6067299 A 20000426; BG 104474 A 20001229; BG 64342 B1 20041029; BR 9906848 A 20001010; CA 2313071 A1 20000413; DE 59904221 D1 20030313; EP 1035966 A1 20000920; EP 1035966 B1 20030205; ID 25497 A 20001005; JP 2002526284 A 20020820; JP 3753940 B2 20060308; KR 100464689 B1 20050105; PT 1035966 E 20030630; TR 200001565 T1 20010420; US 6517472 B1 20030211

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071004

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071004

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060926

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051004

2005-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050404

2005-04-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050404

2004-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-10-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1035966E

2003-09-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030929

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030505

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904221 P 20030313

2003-03-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2003-02-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010731

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000506

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE