Global patent index - EP 1035967 A1

EP 1035967 A1 2000-09-20 - DEVICE FOR OPENING TUBULAR BAG SHAPES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR OPENING TUBULAR BAG SHAPES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÖFFNEN VON SCHLAUCHFÖRMIGEN SACKKÖRPERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'OUVRIR DES SACS TUBULAIRES

Publication

EP 1035967 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99948588 A

Priority

  • AT 9900235 W
  • AT 165798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0020195A1] The invention relates to a device for opening tubular bag shapes which are open at at least at one end, comprising at least one slide which can be introduced into an open end of a bag between the bag walls, in order to at least partially fold over at least one end area of a bag wall. According to the invention, the at least one slide (3) can be moved in and out of the bag end to be opened by means of at least one, driven cam (9) which can be moved along a predetermined path (8) and which engages with the slide (3). The slide (3) preferably takes a circular path (4), said circular path comprising a section which runs parallel to a bag-transporting device. The speed of transportation of the bags (2, 2a) on the conveyor device (1) and that of the slide (3) around the circular path are equal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 31/26 (2006.01); B31B 1/54 (2006.01); B31B 1/78 (2006.01); B31B 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31B 29/00 (2013.01); B31B 1/78 (2013.01); B31B 2201/281 (2013.01); B31B 2221/20 (2013.01); B31B 2221/405 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0020195A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0020195 A1 20000413; AT 406755 B 20000825; AT A165798 A 20000115; AU 6181199 A 20000426; BG 104454 A 20001229; BG 63529 B1 20020430; BR 9906847 A 20001010; CA 2313072 A1 20000413; CA 2313072 C 20061212; CZ 20001813 A3 20000913; CZ 294286 B6 20041110; DE 59902331 D1 20020919; EP 1035967 A1 20000920; EP 1035967 B1 20020814; ID 26825 A 20010215; JP 2002526285 A 20020820; JP 3753941 B2 20060308; KR 100461214 B1 20041214; PT 1035967 E 20021231; TR 200001537 T1 20001121

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071004

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071004

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061019

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050902

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071004

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060926

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051026

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050404

2005-04-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050404

2003-09-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030929

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-05-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 1035967E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021105

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021028

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902331

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-19

2002-09-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011128

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000429

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE