Global Patent Index - EP 1036000 A1

EP 1036000 A1 2000-09-20 - A PACKAGING MACHINE

Title (en)

A PACKAGING MACHINE

Title (de)

VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE D'EMBALLAGE

Publication

EP 1036000 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98948359 A

Priority

  • GB 9719954 A
  • US 9819606 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914120A1] A packaging machine for packaging articles into cartons selected from, at least, a first carton or a second carton is described, wherein the first and second cartons are of a different type or size. The cartons are stored in at least one hopper, and picked for packing by a carton engaging means arranged to remove cartons from said at least one hopper and transport them sequentially to a first predetermined position. From there the cartons are transferred to a paper feed chain which transports the cartons to a second predetermined position, from where the cartons are combined with said articles. The paper feed chain comprises a support means carrying a first endless chain from which is depended a first set of guide lugs and a second endless chain from which is depended a second set of guide lugs. The guide lugs are interleaved to produce carton receiving zones, the length of which can be altered, for different carton sizes or types, by altering the relative positions of the first and second set of guide lugs. The support means is movable such that when the relative positions of the lugs is changed, this change can be compensated for such that the position of the first set of lugs with respect to said first predetermined position is unaltered.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 5/02; B31B 5/80; B65B 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 5/02 (2006.01); B31B 1/80 (2006.01); B31B 3/74 (2006.01); B31B 5/76 (2006.01); B65B 21/24 (2006.01); B65B 43/14 (2006.01); B65B 59/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 59/005 (2013.01); B65B 21/242 (2013.01); B65B 43/145 (2013.01); B31B 50/76 (2017.08); B31B 2100/00 (2017.08); B31B 2120/30 (2017.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914120 A1 19990325; WO 9914120 A9 20020926; AT 245107 T 20030815; AU 734507 B2 20010614; AU 9494798 A 19990405; CA 2303906 A1 19990325; CA 2303906 C 20060905; CN 1121333 C 20030917; CN 1278769 A 20010103; DE 69816477 D1 20030821; DE 69816477 T2 20040527; DK 1036000 T3 20031027; EP 1036000 A1 20000920; EP 1036000 B1 20030716; ES 2203987 T3 20040416; GB 9719954 D0 19971119; HK 1030915 A1 20040227; HU 0100181 A2 20010528; HU 0100181 A3 20010628; HU 224284 B1 20050728; IL 135143 D0 20010520; JP 2002522300 A 20020723; JP 4098471 B2 20080611; PL 188676 B1 20050331; PL 339412 A1 20001218; ZA 9808592 B 19990323

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080921

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080921

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080921

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070922

2008-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070922

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070921

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070917

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070923

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *MEAD CORP.

- Effective date: 20060930

2007-06-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-04-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060926

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-09-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060921

2006-09-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060921

2006-09-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060921

2006-09-01 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060901

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-05 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20051205

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-22 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050922

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-22 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050922

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-21 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-07-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2203987 T3

2003-12-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2003-10-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403914

2003-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2003-10-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69816477 P 20030821

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000926

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE