Global Patent Index - EP 1036003 A1

EP 1036003 A1 2000-09-20 - METHOD FOR CHECKING THAT BATCHES OF CIGARETTES ARE COMPLETE AND THAT THE CIGARETTES ARE SUFFICIENTLY FILLED

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CHECKING THAT BATCHES OF CIGARETTES ARE COMPLETE AND THAT THE CIGARETTES ARE SUFFICIENTLY FILLED

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR KONTROLLE DER VOLLZÄHLIGKEIT VON ZIGARETTENGRUPPEN UND DER BEFÜLLUNG DER ZIGARETTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR VERIFIER QUE DES GROUPES DE CIGARETTES SONT COMPLETS ET QUE CELLES-CI SONT SUFFISAMMENT REMPLIES

Publication

EP 1036003 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963471 A

Priority

  • DE 19753333 A
  • EP 9807360 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19753333A1] The invention relates to a method for checking that batches of cigarettes are complete and that the cigarettes are sufficiently filled. In spite of careful manufacturing, when cigarettes are produced and batches of cigarettes are filled in cigarette packs (11) using high-performance machines, it is possible that some of the packs of cigarettes manufactured have cigarettes missing or contain cigarettes which are not sufficiently filled with tobacco. The invention provides an improved, non-contact method of checking the batches of cigarettes or the individual cigarettes. According to this method, the intensity signal of a CCD camera or a CCD-line-scanning chip in subareas of the front ends (24) of the cigarettes and/or the spaces between them is measured and analysed in the front end area of the batch of cigarettes. The inventive method therefore provides a means of checking that batches of cigarettes are complete and that the cigarettes are sufficiently filled in high-performance machines such as pocket conveyors or revolving folders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 19/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/32 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19753333 A1 19990610; BR 9814714 A 20001003; BR 9814714 B1 20140930; CN 1105061 C 20030409; CN 1280541 A 20010117; EP 1036003 A1 20000920; EP 1036003 B1 20040303; ES 2216342 T3 20041016; JP 2001524425 A 20011204; US 6531693 B1 20030311; WO 9928190 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810930

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131117

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131117

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131117

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121118

2014-03-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140305

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121116

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121114

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111216

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2005-02-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2216342 T3

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-05-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810930 P 20040408

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010430

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000325

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL