Global Patent Index - EP 1036006 A1

EP 1036006 A1 2000-09-20 - TOOLING FOR FORMING PACKAGING FROM UNITARY BLANKS

Title (en)

TOOLING FOR FORMING PACKAGING FROM UNITARY BLANKS

Title (de)

WERKZEUG ZUM FORMEN VON VERPACKUNGEN AUS EINSTÜCKIGEN ZUSCHNITTEN

Title (fr)

OUTILLAGE DE FRAPPE POUR FORMER DES ARTICLES D'EMBALLAGE A PARTIR D'EBAUCHES UNITAIRES

Publication

EP 1036006 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98962917 A

Priority

  • US 9825826 W
  • US 6745397 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928192A1] An apparatus for the formation of packaging from unitary blanks comprising a first tool (10) having a convex end surface (12) said convex end surface having edges (16) that define a first center segment (14) and a first plurality of triangular segments (18) and a second tool (40) having a convave end surface (42) said concave end surface having edges (46) that define a second center segment (44) and a second plurality of triangular segments (48).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 43/10; B31B 3/00; B31B 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 3/00 (2006.01); B31B 3/28 (2006.01); B65B 43/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/10 (2013.01); B31B 2150/00 (2017.08); B31B 2160/20 (2017.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928192 A1 19990610; CA 2316869 A1 19990610; DE 69813877 D1 20030528; EP 1036006 A1 20000920; EP 1036006 B1 20030423

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-04-23 [REG GB S28] RESTORATION OF CEASED PATENTS (SECT. 28/PAT. ACT 1977)

2007-07-25 [REG GB 728V] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION FILED (SECT. 28/1977)

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051204

2005-12-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051204

2004-04-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-07-24 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69813877 P 20030528

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL