Global Patent Index - EP 1036016 A1

EP 1036016 A1 2000-09-20 - PACKAGING FOR LIGHT INSULATING MATERIAL PANELS USED FOR CONSTRUCTION PURPOSES, ESPECIALLY FOR EXPANDABLE POLYSTYRENE INSULATING MATERIAL PANELS

Title (en)

PACKAGING FOR LIGHT INSULATING MATERIAL PANELS USED FOR CONSTRUCTION PURPOSES, ESPECIALLY FOR EXPANDABLE POLYSTYRENE INSULATING MATERIAL PANELS

Title (de)

VERPACKUNG FÜR LEICHTDÄMMSTOFFPLATTEN FÜR BAUZWECKE, INSBESONDERE FÜR EPS-DÄMMSTOFFPLATTEN

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGE POUR PANNEAUX EN MATERIAU ISOLANT LEGER DESTINES A LA CONSTRUCTION, EN PARTICULIER POUR PANNEAUX EN POLYSTYRENE EXPANSE

Publication

EP 1036016 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913236 A

Priority

  • DE 19810514 A
  • DE 29804315 U
  • DE 29807646 U
  • DE 29808818 U
  • EP 9901461 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9946181A1] The invention relates to packaging (10) for light insulating material panels (12) used for construction purposes, especially for expandable polystyrene insulating material panels. Said packaging is provided with a film sheathing (14) having a middle section (16) and two opposing end sections (18, 20) which comprise free ends (22, 24) and which are located on the front faces. Said end sections are provided for enclosing a plurality of adjacent light insulating material panels (12) having front faces. The end sections (18, 20) of the film sheathing (14), said sections being located on the front faces, extend above the front faces of the light insulating material panels (12). The end sections (18, 20) of the film sheathing (14), said sections being located on the front faces, are each held together by means of a holding device (26). Said holding devices (26) are arranged between the middle section (16) and the free ends (22, 24) within said end sections (18, 20) of the film sheathing (14) in order to grasp the area (30, 32) to be held together of the end sections (18, 20) of the film sheathing (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/56; B65D 75/10; E04G 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/56 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01); B65D 77/16 (2006.01); B65D 85/46 (2006.01); E04G 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/5827 (2013.01); E04G 5/003 (2013.01); B65D 75/56 (2013.01); B65D 77/16 (2013.01); B65D 85/46 (2013.01); E04G 5/00 (2013.01); B65D 2205/00 (2013.01); B65D 2575/565 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9946181 A1 19990916; AT 208331 T 20011115; AU 3144199 A 19990927; EP 1036016 A1 20000920; EP 1036016 B1 20011107; EP 1036016 B2 20060426

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090306

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090306

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090306

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090306

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090306

2009-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KNAUF MARMORIT G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080321

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080319

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080318

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-15 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2006-08-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-08-23 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-05-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2006-04-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KNAUF MARMORIT GMBH

- Free text: MARMORIT GMBH#ELLIGHOFEN 6#79283 BOLLSCHWEIL (DE) -TRANSFER TO- KNAUF MARMORIT GMBH#ELLIGHOFEN 6#79283 BOLLSCHWEIL (DE)

2006-04-26 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

2006-04-26 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 75/56 20060101AFI20060307BHEP

2006-04-26 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 75/10 20060101ALI20060307BHEP

2006-04-26 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04G 5/00 20060101ALI20060307BHEP

2005-01-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KNAUF MARMORIT GMBH

2002-10-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH & CO. OHG

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-10-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BRILLUX GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-09-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH & CO. OHG

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-02-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900405 20011213

2001-12-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

2001-11-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 208331 T 20011115

2000-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PACKAGED LIGHT INSULATING MATERIAL PANELS USED FOR CONSTRUCTION PURPOSES, ESPECIALLY EXPANDABLE POLYSTYRENE INSULATING MATERIAL PANELS

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL