Global Patent Index - EP 1036019 A1

EP 1036019 A1 2000-09-20 - USE OF A BOWL FOR CONTAINING A PIECE OF CREAM CAKE

Title (en)

USE OF A BOWL FOR CONTAINING A PIECE OF CREAM CAKE

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG EINER BECHERS ZUM AUFNEHMEN EINES SAHNETÖRTCHENS

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'UN MOULE POUR RECEVOIR UNE TARTELETTE A LA CREME

Publication

EP 1036019 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963535 A

Priority

  • DE 19753632 A
  • DE 29721145 U
  • EP 9807855 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928214A1] The invention relates to the use of a bowl (1) with a hermetically closed lid (2), used for containing a piece of cake (3). Pegs (10) are provided underneath the bottom (1b) of the bowl (1). Said pegs (10) protrude from the bottom (1b) to such an extent that they can be easily cut-off. By cutting-off the bearing surface (12) of the pegs the interior (11) of the bowl and the exterior of the bowl (1) communicate directly, through the bottom (1b) of the bowl via the cavity (13). This means that, in the case of a piece of cake, e.g. a piece of cream cake, placed in said bowl (3), air under atmospheric pressure reaches the space between the piece of cake and the bottom (1b) of the bowl (1). This makes it easier to detach the piece of cake from the bottom (1b) of the bowl (1) and therefore, no parting agent needs to be applied between the piece of cake and the bottom (1b) of the bowl (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/72; B65D 25/14; B65D 81/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/14 (2006.01); B65D 81/34 (2006.01); B65D 85/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/14 (2013.01); B65D 81/34 (2013.01); B65D 85/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928214A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928214 A1 19990610; AT 309155 T 20051115; DE 59813186 D1 20051215; EP 1036019 A1 20000920; EP 1036019 B1 20051109

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59813186

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101203

2011-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091111

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091217

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-02-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060220

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813186 P 20051215

2005-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI NL

2005-11-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-11-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-05-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF A BOWL FOR CONTAINING A PIECE OF CREAM CAKE

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021118

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000711

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI NL