Global patent index - EP 1036026 A1

EP 1036026 A1 2000-09-20 - MACHINE FOR WINDING CONTINUOUS SHEET PRODUCT FOR FORMING COILS

Title (en)

MACHINE FOR WINDING CONTINUOUS SHEET PRODUCT FOR FORMING COILS

Title (de)

WICKELMASCHINE FÜR BAHNEN, ZUM WICKELN VON ROLLEN

Title (fr)

MACHINE D'ENROULEMENT DE PRODUIT CONTINU SOUS FORME DE FEUILLE, POUR FORMER DES BOBINES

Publication

EP 1036026 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98954529 A

Priority

  • FR 9802373 W
  • FR 9714188 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2770503A1] The invention concerns a machine comprising an assembly (1) consisting of a frame (2) around which is mounted a rotating cylinder (3) equipped with at least two parallel core shafts (5). Said assembly (1) is mounted mobile in translation along a horizontal direction perpendicular to the axes (4, 6) of the cylinder (3) and of the core shafts (5), while the means feeding (10) the sheet product (9) are fixed. The displacement in translation of the mobile assembly (1) enables it to move forward gradually as the diameter of the coil which is being formed increases, and also provides, between said assembly (1) and the feeding means (10), a free space (E) available for an operator, for introducing the front end (16) of the strip product (9) on one of the shafts (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/22; B65H 18/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/02 (2006.01); B65H 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/2215 (2013.01); B65H 2402/40 (2013.01); B65H 2408/23152 (2013.01); B65H 2601/321 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924342A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2770503 A1 19990507; FR 2770503 B1 20000121; AT 214678 T 20020415; DE 69804349 D1 20020425; DE 69804349 T2 20021010; EP 1036026 A1 20000920; EP 1036026 B1 20020320; ES 2173637 T3 20021016; JP 2001522767 A 20011120; JP 4195187 B2 20081210; US 6371399 B1 20020416; WO 9924342 A1 19990520

INPADOC legal status

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131106

2015-03-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150327

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131105

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69804349

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131105

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131105

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131105

2014-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 214678

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20131105

2014-06-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ANDRITZ A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20131130

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69804349

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KOEPE & PARTNER, DE

2011-07-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANDRITZ AG, AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69804349

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-11 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: ANDRITZ AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20110330

2011-03-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2011-01-26 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20110110

2011-01-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20101216 AND 20101222

2009-11-13 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RG

2007-05-25 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: GC

2007-01-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2005-07-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-06-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2005-05-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: DMT TECHNOLOGY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2005-03-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2173637

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69804349

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-25

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 214678

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010615

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000515

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL