Global Patent Index - EP 1036027 A1

EP 1036027 A1 2000-09-20 - WEB INTRODUCTION ARRANGEMENT FOR A WINDING MACHINE

Title (en)

WEB INTRODUCTION ARRANGEMENT FOR A WINDING MACHINE

Title (de)

BAHNEINZUGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR WICKELMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'INTRODUCTION DE BANDE POUR EMBOBINEUSE

Publication

EP 1036027 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98930797 A

Priority

  • DE 29710225 U
  • EP 9803542 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9856700A1] This invention is related to a web introduction arrangement for a winding machine for winding up web-like winding material such as one or more paper webs (10, 10', 10'', ...) with a support cylinder (14) wrapped by part of the web for at least partial support of the roll/rolls to be wound (20, 20', 20'', ...). The problem of proposing a functionally secure web introduction device which can be used in the winding machine even under difficult geometrical situations and preferably without applying a vacuum is solved by a number of pressure rollers or cylinders (31A, 32A, 33A) arranged essentially parallel to the first support cylinder (14) in machine direction and distributed on the portion of the circumference of the support cylinder (14) wrapped by the web (10, 10', 10'', ...) and by drive units for radial and also, at least in part, circumferential displacement of the pressure rollers or cylinders from a rest position into a contact pressure position and vice versa, wherein the pressure rollers or cylinders consist of at least two axially spaced component rollers or cylinders (31A, 31A; 32A, 32A; 33A, 33A) for each circumferential position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/28; B65H 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/08 (2013.01); B65H 2301/414866 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9856700A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29710225 U1 19981022; AT 275086 T 20040915; AU 8110898 A 19981230; EP 1036027 A1 20000920; EP 1036027 B1 20040901; WO 9856700 A1 19981217

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070612

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060612

2007-02-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060613

2006-06-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060612

2006-06-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060612

2006-06-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060612

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-08-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050801

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-22 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050622

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050617

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69826026 P 20041007

2004-10-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT SE

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-08-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2003-01-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT SE

2002-11-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GL&V MANAGEMENT HUNGARY KFT

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000111

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT SE

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE