Global Patent Index - EP 1036031 A1

EP 1036031 A1 2000-09-20 - DEVICE FOR DISCHARGING A LIQUID

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DISCHARGING A LIQUID

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSBRINGEN EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR EXPRIMER UN LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 1036031 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965678 A

Priority

  • DE 19753286 A
  • EP 9807401 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19753286A1] The invention relates to a device for discharging a liquid, comprising a container (1) which contains the liquid, and a mobile element (2) for reducing the volume of the container. The aim of the invention is to discharge the liquid with a very constant volume per unit of time and without any danger of particles forming and the liquid becoming contaminated as a result. To this end, the mobile element (2) is connected by bellows (5) to an inner wall of the container (1) in such a way that it is liquid tight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 5/02; F04B 43/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/00 (2006.01); B67D 1/10 (2006.01); B67D 7/02 (2010.01); F04B 43/02 (2006.01); F04B 43/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/0227 (2013.01); B67D 1/102 (2013.01); F04B 43/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928232A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19753286 A1 19990610; DE 19753286 C2 20010301; AT 207449 T 20011115; EP 1036031 A1 20000920; EP 1036031 B1 20011024; JP 2001524431 A 20011204; TW 436879 B 20010528; US 6360921 B1 20020326; WO 9928232 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051118

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2003-11-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031107

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-07-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STEAG MICROTECH G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021118

2002-11-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021118

2002-11-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021104

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020106

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011220

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-11-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20011129

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801898 20011129

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 207449 T 20011115

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000203

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL