Global patent index - EP 1036107 A1

EP 1036107 A1 2000-09-20 - POLYETHER ESTER AMIDES

Title (en)

POLYETHER ESTER AMIDES

Title (de)

POLYETHERESTERAMIDE

Title (fr)

POLYETHERESTERAMIDES

Publication

EP 1036107 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98956937 A

Priority

  • DE 19753532 A
  • DE 19753534 A
  • EP 9807458 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6344535B1] Polyether ester amides having high water vapor permeability are disclosed. The amides which are prepared simply and reliably, crystallize quickly, are biodegradable and/or compostable, and are suitable in the manufacture of films by extrusion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 69/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 69/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 69/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928371A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6344535 B1 20020205; AU 1339699 A 19990616; CA 2312479 A1 19990610; CN 1278839 A 20010103; EP 1036107 A1 20000920; JP 2001525433 A 20011211; NO 20002677 A 20000525; NO 20002677 D0 20000525; WO 9928371 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020618

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011206

2000-11-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE