Global Patent Index - EP 1036141 A1

EP 1036141 A1 2000-09-20 - METHOD FOR DEFOAMING FUELS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DEFOAMING FUELS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ENTSCHÄUMEN VON TREIBSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR EMPECHER DES CARBURANTS DE MOUSSER

Publication

EP 1036141 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98964442 A

Priority

  • DE 19753792 A
  • EP 9807613 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19753792A1] According to the inventive method for defoaming fuels, an effective quantity of at least one compound of formula (I) is added to the fuel. The radicals R<1>, R<2> and R<3> in said formula represent an alkyl or hydroxyalkyl radical with 1 to 4 C-atoms, an aryl or alkylaryl radical, or a radical of formula (II) independently of each other, A<-> being an anion, n being a number 2 or 3, p being a number from 1 to 3 and R<4> representing an alkyl or alkenyl radical with 7 to 21 C-atoms and 0, 1, 2 or three double bonds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 1/22; B01D 19/04; C07C 219/06; C07C 219/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 19/04 (2006.01); C07C 219/06 (2006.01); C07C 219/08 (2006.01); C10L 1/08 (2006.01); C10L 1/14 (2006.01); C10L 1/182 (2006.01); C10L 1/185 (2006.01); C10L 1/22 (2006.01); C10L 1/222 (2006.01); C10L 1/223 (2006.01); C10L 10/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/2225 (2013.01); C10L 1/08 (2013.01); C10L 1/14 (2013.01); C10L 1/2235 (2013.01); C10L 10/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929811A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19753792 A1 19990610; AU 1964299 A 19990628; AU 735528 B2 20010712; CA 2312064 A1 19990719; EP 1036141 A1 20000920; JP 2001526300 A 20011218; WO 9929811 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030403

2002-12-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF ESTERS COMPRISING QUATERNARY AMMONIUM GROUPS FOR DEFOAMING DIESEL FUELS

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE