Global Patent Index - EP 1036146 A1

EP 1036146 A1 2000-09-20 - DISHWASHING DETERGENT WITH ANTIBACTERIAL and antiviral ACTION

Title (en)

DISHWASHING DETERGENT WITH ANTIBACTERIAL and antiviral ACTION

Title (de)

GESCHIRRSPÜLMITTEL MIT ANTIBAKTERIELLER und antiviraler WIRKUNG

Title (fr)

DETERGENT A VAISSELLE A ACTION ANTIBACTERIENNE et antivirale

Publication

EP 1036146 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98958927 A

Priority

  • DE 19753982 A
  • EP 9807698 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19753982A1] The invention relates to an especially compatible hand dishwashing detergent which can be perfumed in any way, cleans excellently, is skin compatible, temperature-stable, stable in storage, and ecological. The detergent has a specific antibacterial activity during concentrated application on wet work surfaces, kitchen appliances while using wet cleaning towels, sponges and brushes. The detergent is provided by adding one or more carboxylic acids and/or the salts thereof having antibacterial action to a tensidic mixture comprised of anionic tensides and/or nonanionic tensides and/or betaine tensides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/94; C11D 3/00; C11D 3/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/48 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/48 (2013.01); C11D 1/94 (2013.01); C11D 3/2086 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/29 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929815A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19753982 A1 19990610; AT 287940 T 20050215; EP 1036146 A1 20000920; EP 1036146 B1 20050126; ES 2236963 T3 20050716; JP 2001526301 A 20011218; WO 9929815 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20051130

2007-10-17 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20070315

2005-12-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER (UK) LIMITED

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051128

2005-11-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2236963

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050404

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59812520

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2004-09-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DISHWASHING DETERGENT WITH ANTIBACTERIAL AND ANTIVIRAL ACTION

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020208

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL