Global Patent Index - EP 1036148 A1

EP 1036148 A1 2000-09-20 - CARPET CLEANING POWDER WITH A SOURCE OF ACTIVE OXYGEN

Title (en)

CARPET CLEANING POWDER WITH A SOURCE OF ACTIVE OXYGEN

Title (de)

TEPPICHREINIGUNGSPULVER MIT EINER AKTIVSAUERSTOFFQUELLE

Title (fr)

NETTOYANT PULVERULENT POUR TAPIS, A SOURCE D'OXYGENE ACTIF

Publication

EP 1036148 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965183 A

Priority

  • DE 19753700 A
  • EP 9807616 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19753700A1] The invention relates to a gentle carpet cleaning preparation which is also stable in storage, can be sprinkled, and is highly effective in terms of cleaning. The inventive preparation is obtained by combining cellulose powder and an active oxygen constituent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/22; C11D 3/39; C11D 7/18; C11D 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/36 (2006.01); C11D 3/382 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/0031 (2013.01); C11D 3/361 (2013.01); C11D 3/382 (2013.01); C11D 3/3942 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/29 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929817A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19753700 A1 19990610; AT 283341 T 20041215; EP 1036148 A1 20000920; EP 1036148 B1 20041124; ES 2234174 T3 20050616; JP 2001526302 A 20011218; WO 9929817 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2234174

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-05-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050224

2004-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59812309

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041125

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-11-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041124

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL