Global Patent Index - EP 1036150 A1

EP 1036150 A1 2000-09-20 - CLEANING AGENT AND METHOD FOR CLEANING VEHICLES

Title (en)

CLEANING AGENT AND METHOD FOR CLEANING VEHICLES

Title (de)

REINIGUNGSMITTEL UND REINIGUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR FAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

NETTOYANT ET PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE POUR VEHICULES

Publication

EP 1036150 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965702 A

Priority

  • DE 19753825 A
  • EP 9807641 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19753825A1] The invention relates to a cleaning agent for hard surfaces, containing 0.1 to 20 wt. % fibres with a length of between 0.5 and 5 mm, 0.05 to 5 wt. % thickening agent and if necessary, as much alkalisation agent as is required to obtain a pH value of 7 to 14. The invention also relates to the use of this cleaning agent for cleaning the external surfaces of vehicles. The inventive cleaning agent is diluted with water according to a ratio of 1:1000 to 1:6, sprayed onto the surfaces to be cleaned, allowed to take effect and then rinsed off with water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/382; C11D 7/44; C11D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/382 (2006.01); C11D 7/44 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/44 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/382 (2013.01); C11D 11/0041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929819A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19753825 A1 19990610; EP 1036150 A1 20000920; EP 1036150 B1 20030917; ES 2209241 T3 20040616; NO 20002842 A 20000602; NO 20002842 D0 20000602; WO 9929819 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051128

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051128

2005-11-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051126

2004-12-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041214

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041109

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209241 T3

2003-12-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-11-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031114

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809665 P 20031023

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR IT

2003-09-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-04-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR CLEANING VEHICLES

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000527

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR IT