Global Patent Index - EP 1036157 A1

EP 1036157 A1 2000-09-20 - DISH WASHING DETERGENT WITH A SPECIFIC VISCOSITY PROFILE

Title (en)

DISH WASHING DETERGENT WITH A SPECIFIC VISCOSITY PROFILE

Title (de)

GESCHIRRSPÜLMITTEL MIT SPEZIFISCHEM VISKOSITÄTSPROFIL

Title (fr)

DETERGENT A VAISSELLE A PROFIL DE VISCOSITE SPECIFIQUE

Publication

EP 1036157 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963466 A

Priority

  • DE 19752454 A
  • DE 19817833 A
  • EP 9807346 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9927062A1] The invention relates to pourable detergents for washing dishes by hand which remain stable in storage and which have a specific viscosity profile. The detergents contain tenside mixtures of anionic tensides and/or non-ionic tensides and/or betaine tensides and between 0.01 and 5 wt. % polymers, and preferably have (1) a viscosity of between 1,300 and 9,000 mPa.s at 20 DEG C and with a shear rate of 10 s<-1> or a viscosity of between 500 and 8,000 mPa.s at 20 DEG C and with a shear rate of 30 s<-1> and/or (2) 0.2 to 60 wt. % tenside mixture and/or (3) 0.2 to 49.8 wt. % anionic tensides, 0.1 to 14.9 wt. % non-ionic tensides and 0.1 to 14.9 wt. % betaine tensides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 1/83; C11D 1/94; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3765 (2013.01); C11D 1/94 (2013.01); C11D 1/29 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927062A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9927062 A1 19990603; AT 275188 T 20040915; DE 19817833 A1 19991028; EP 1036157 A1 20000920; EP 1036157 B1 20040901; JP 2001524589 A 20011204; JP 4365024 B2 20091118

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-06-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-03-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040901

2005-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-12-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041212

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59811905

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL