Global Patent Index - EP 1036205 A1

EP 1036205 A1 2000-09-20 - METHOD AND OXYGEN LANCE FOR INJECTING GASES INTO A METALLURGICAL TANK

Title (en)

METHOD AND OXYGEN LANCE FOR INJECTING GASES INTO A METALLURGICAL TANK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND BLASLANZE ZUM EINBLASEN VON GASEN IN METALLURGISCHE GEFÄSSE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET LANCE DE SOUFFLAGE POUR INJECTER DES GAZ DANS DES CUVES METALLURGIQUES

Publication

EP 1036205 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963387 A

Priority

  • DE 9803512 W
  • DE 19755876 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19755876A1] The invention relates to a method and an oxygen lance for processing molten metal baths in vacuum treatment tanks, more particularly steel in RH tanks, having a central pipe and a jacket pipe coaxially arranged thereon that can be cooled with a cooling medium. The central pipe and the jacket pipe are attached to supply lines which are connected to an oxygen, a combustible gas and an inert gas station and to a solid matter feeding device. The cooled jacket pipe (26) is separated from the central pipe (22) throughout its entire length. The free ring surface (AR) between both pipes (22, 26) complies with AR = 0.8 to 1.2 x AZ and AZ = free cross-section area of the central pipe. The mouth of the central pipe is Laval-shaped. The mouth of the nozzle (24) of the central pipe (22) is arranged inside the jacket tube (26) at a distance (a), wherein a = 0.5 to 0.8 x d and d = free diameter of the central pipe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 7/10; C21C 5/46; C21C 5/52; C21C 7/072

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 5/46 (2006.01); C21C 7/072 (2006.01); C21C 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21C 7/10 (2013.01); C21C 5/4606 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929915A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19755876 A1 19990617; DE 19755876 C2 20000224; AT 224958 T 20021015; AU 1869199 A 19990628; AU 748298 B2 20020530; BR 9814253 A 20001003; CA 2312775 A1 19990617; CN 1280630 A 20010117; EP 1036205 A1 20000920; EP 1036205 B1 20020925; ES 2180224 T3 20030201; JP 2001526320 A 20011218; US 6432165 B1 20020813; WO 9929915 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *THYSSENKRUPP STAHL A.G.

- Effective date: 20041130

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041125

2005-11-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-11-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-07-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041124

2005-07-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *THYSSENKRUPP STAHL A.G.

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041125

2004-11-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041125

2004-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041124

2003-12-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031120

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031030

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031028

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031028

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031024

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180224 T3

2002-11-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021021

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805743 20021031

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224958 T 20021015

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE