Global Patent Index - EP 1036223 A1

EP 1036223 A1 2000-09-20 - PROCESS FOR EXTRUDING FIBERS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR EXTRUDING FIBERS

Title (de)

EXTRUSIONSVERFAHREN FÜR FASERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'EXTRUSION DE FIBRES

Publication

EP 1036223 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98960619 A

Priority

  • EP 98960619 A
  • EP 97203812 A
  • US 9825517 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0921216A1] The present invention provides a process for obtaining a fiber comprising the steps of: melt extruding a mixture of a thermoplastic polymer and a hydrophilicity imparting compound A to form a plurality of filaments; applying a spin finish to said filaments; and spinning said filaments into a fiber; characterised in that said spin finish comprises a fluorochemical oil and/or water repellent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 1/10; D01F 6/04; D01F 6/06; D06M 13/213; D06M 15/277; D06M 15/576

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 13/21 (2006.01); D01F 1/10 (2006.01); D01F 6/04 (2006.01); D01F 6/06 (2006.01); D01F 6/10 (2006.01); D01F 6/46 (2006.01); D06M 13/213 (2006.01); D06M 13/438 (2006.01); D06M 15/256 (2006.01); D06M 15/277 (2006.01); D06M 15/576 (2006.01); D06M 101/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/277 (2013.01); D01F 1/10 (2013.01); D01F 6/04 (2013.01); D01F 6/06 (2013.01); D06M 7/00 (2013.01); D06M 15/256 (2013.01); D06M 2101/20 (2013.01); D06M 2200/11 (2013.01); D06M 2200/12 (2013.01); D06M 2200/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929936A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0921216 A1 19990609; AU 1617599 A 19990628; AU 742193 B2 20011220; CN 1280635 A 20010117; DE 69817014 D1 20030911; DE 69817014 T2 20040609; EP 1036223 A1 20000920; EP 1036223 B1 20030806; JP 2001526326 A 20011218; WO 9929936 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MINNESOTA MINING AND MFG CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071231

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-02-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070206

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061222

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69817014

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020626

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL