Global Patent Index - EP 1036227 A1

EP 1036227 A1 2000-09-20 - METHOD AND DEVICES FOR PRODUCING A TEXTILE LAP

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICES FOR PRODUCING A TEXTILE LAP

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES TEXTILEN VLIESES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIFS POUR PRODUIRE UNE NAPPE TEXTILE

Publication

EP 1036227 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98954520 A

Priority

  • FR 9802364 W
  • FR 9714065 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2770855A1] The invention concerns a card or any other apparatus for producing a web (1) feeding a distributor layer (2) two elementary webs (15a, 15b) constituting a lap web (16) deposited in reciprocating motion on a transverse output conveyor (26). In the apparatus (1) means for adjusting the speed of card doffers (13a, 13b), condensers (17, 18), web doffers (19a, 19b),cylinder (4) and/or feeder (7), and/or means for adjusting the cylinder-card doffer spacing affect the surface weight of the elementary web depending on the surface weight required at each point in the lap (67) width to be constituted on the output conveyor (26). The method consists in determining the delay incurred by each elementary web section for which the weight is being adjusted relative to the lap web being deposited; deducting therefrom the position where each web section will be deposited when the adjustment for its weight is carried out, thereby determining the weight adjustment to be applied thereto. The invention is useful for producing with high industrial flexibility laps with great variety of profiles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 25/00; D01G 15/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/46 (2006.01); D01G 25/00 (2006.01); D04H 1/74 (2006.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/74 (2013.01); D01G 15/46 (2013.01); D01G 25/00 (2013.01); D04H 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924650A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2770855 A1 19990514; FR 2770855 B1 20000128; AT 274081 T 20040915; CA 2310121 A1 19990520; CN 1188556 C 20050209; CN 1285011 A 20010221; DE 69825782 D1 20040923; DE 69825782 T2 20050901; EP 1036227 A1 20000920; EP 1036227 B1 20040818; ES 2227887 T3 20050401; JP 2001522949 A 20011120; US 6195844 B1 20010306; WO 9924650 A1 19990520

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161114

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69825782

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2014-04-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ANDRITZ ASSELIN-THIBEAU

2013-12-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: AUTEFA SOLUTIONS GERMANY GMBH

- Effective date: 20050512

2010-05-28 [REG FR ER] ERRATA LISTED IN THE FRENCH OFFICIAL JOURNAL (BOPI)

2010-05-28 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081105

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081105

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-10-05 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2007-10-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-06-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-07-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: AUTEFA AUTOMATION GMBH

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-07-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AUTEFA AUTOMATION GMBH

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2227887 T3

2005-01-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041209

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69825782 P 20040923

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020724

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT