Global Patent Index - EP 1036228 A1

EP 1036228 A1 2000-09-20 - DEVICE FOR REGULATING THE THREAD TENSION OF DOUP END THREADS AND STANDING END THREADS GUIDED THROUGH A GAUZE SELVEDGE DEVICE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR REGULATING THE THREAD TENSION OF DOUP END THREADS AND STANDING END THREADS GUIDED THROUGH A GAUZE SELVEDGE DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGULIERUNG DER FADENSPANNUNG DER DURCH EINE DREHERKANTENVORRICHTUNG GEFÜHRTEN DREHER- UND STEHERFÄDEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION DE LA TENSION DE FILS DE TOUR ET DE FILS FIXES GUIDES A TRAVERS UN DISPOSITIF DE LISIERE A POINT DE GAZE

Publication

EP 1036228 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962201 A

Priority

  • DE 9803201 W
  • DE 19748409 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9923288A1] A device for regulating the thread tension of doup end threads and standing end threads that are guided through a gauze selvedge device, characterised in that a mounting (63) for the standing end threads and/or right hand threads (4, 5) is maintained in an elastic, flexible manner under stress.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 7/00; D03D 49/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/40 (2006.01); D03C 7/00 (2006.01); D03D 49/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 7/00 (2013.01); D03D 49/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923288A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9923288 A1 19990514; AT 218632 T 20020615; EP 1036228 A1 20000920; EP 1036228 B1 20020605; ES 2177114 T3 20021201; JP 2002528651 A 20020903; JP 3546330 B2 20040728; PT 1036228 E 20020930; US 6244304 B1 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101104

2012-01-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110503

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-06-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-05-10 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110503

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-03-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091112

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091113

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2006-05-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2006-03-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: GEBRUEDER KLOECKER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20060104

2006-02-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2006-02-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GEBRUEDER KLOECKER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2177114

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804368

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-11

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 218632

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011102

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT