Global Patent Index - EP 1036231 A2

EP 1036231 A2 2000-09-20 - AUTOMATICALLY CONTROLLED WASHING MACHINE WITH A LYE ROLLING SYSTEM

Title (en)

AUTOMATICALLY CONTROLLED WASHING MACHINE WITH A LYE ROLLING SYSTEM

Title (de)

AUTOMATISCH GESTEUERTE WASCHMASCHINE MIT EINEM LAUGENUMWÄLZSYSTEM

Title (fr)

LAVE-LINGE A COMMANDE AUTOMATIQUE AVEC SYSTEME DE CIRCULATION DE LESSIVE

Publication

EP 1036231 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98963414 A

Priority

  • DE 19748706 A
  • EP 9807064 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19748706A1] Lye is carried away by means of a pump (10) on the bottom of a washing treatment area (1) and is delivered again via a conduit (9) above the laundry (3) which is located in the treatment area (1). The washing machine is additionally connected to a fresh water supply line (5) which can be opened or closed by a valve (7). The valve can be controlled by a suitable sensor device (12) which determines an available volume current in the delivery direction of the pump (10). A separate sensor element provided for controlling the delivery of fresh water can thus be spared due to the fact that a body (13) is arranged in the course of the conduit (9). Said body can be actuated by the prevailing volume current in the conduit (9). The body rises or frees the measured section (18) according to the availability or the non-availability of a volume current in the measured section (18) of a turbitity sensor (17). Finally, the valve (7) is controlled in the opening or closing positions thereof by the turbitity sensor (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/00 (2006.01); D06F 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/083 (2013.01); D06F 39/004 (2013.01); D06F 39/088 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923292A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19748706 A1 19990506; AT 214440 T 20020315; EP 1036231 A2 20000920; EP 1036231 B1 20020313; ES 2174525 T3 20021101; TR 200001158 T2 20001121; US 6378341 B1 20020430; WO 9923292 A2 19990514; WO 9923292 A3 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091105

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110310

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091104

2011-03-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110324

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091104

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091104

2010-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081118

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-11-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061104

2005-11-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174525 T3

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803380 20020418

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-03-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214440 T 20020315

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010725

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI