Global Patent Index - EP 1036269 A1

EP 1036269 A1 2000-09-20 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL ENGINE INJECTION

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL ENGINE INJECTION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN DER KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZUNG EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DE L'INJECTION D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1036269 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98958328 A

Priority

  • FR 9802621 W
  • FR 9715407 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2772078A1] The invention concerns a method which consists in placing two sensors (SD1, SD2) upstream and downstream of the catalyst container (CAT). When the downstream sensor (SD2) supplies a richness condition of the injected mixture, different from the richness condition supplied by the upstream sensor, the method consists in correcting the amount of fuel injected based on the downstream sensor alone, except if the latter is stoichiometric condition, in which case a double corrective loop of richness is carried out.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1441 (2013.01); F02D 41/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930022A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2772078 A1 19990611; FR 2772078 B1 20000218; DE 69806964 D1 20020905; DE 69806964 T2 20021205; EP 1036269 A1 20000920; EP 1036269 B1 20020731; ES 2177099 T3 20021201; JP 2001526353 A 20011218; JP 4054529 B2 20080227; WO 9930022 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177099 T3

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69806964 20020905

2002-08-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010808

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT