Global patent index - EP 1036271 A1

EP 1036271 A1 2000-09-20 - INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERMITTENT FUEL INJECTION

Title (en)

INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERMITTENT FUEL INJECTION

Title (de)

EINSPRITZVENTIL ZUR INTERMITTIERENDEN BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZUNG

Title (fr)

INJECTEUR POUR INJECTION DE CARBURANT INTERMITTENTE

Publication

EP 1036271 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965750 A

Priority

  • DE 19754050 A
  • EP 9807857 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930029A1] The invention relates to an injection valve for intermittently injecting fuel into the combustion chamber of an internal combustion chamber in which the valve actuator (4) is arranged in a valve actuator holder (14). Said holder extends up to the immediate proximity of the valve seat (6) so that the valve actuator (4) has only small dimensions and a small mass.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 61/04 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/04 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 61/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930029A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930029 A1 19990617; DE 19754050 A1 19990715; EP 1036271 A1 20000920; EP 1036271 B1 20020327

INPADOC legal status

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803566

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-02

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010726

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE