Global Patent Index - EP 1036279 A1

EP 1036279 A1 2000-09-20 - ASSEMBLING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR FURNITURE

Title (en)

ASSEMBLING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR FURNITURE

Title (de)

MONTAGEVORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR MÖBEL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ASSEMBLAGE, NOTAMMENT POUR MEUBLES

Publication

EP 1036279 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98921580 A

Priority

  • FR 9800806 W
  • FR 9704955 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2762366A1] The invention concerns a device for assembling at least two elements to be made integral forming between them a fixed non-straight angle characterised in that it comprises two opposing pieces (3 and 4), one (3) substantially concave designed to be pressed outside the angle formed by the elements (1 and 2) and the other (4) substantially convex designed to be pressed inside said angle. Said two pieces (3 and 4) are to be directly pressed against the elements to be assembled with an assembling member (5-26) at least to bring together said two parts (3 and 4) passing through a space (15) separating the edges of the elements (1 and 2) to be located parallel, so as to clamp said elements (1 and 2) between the two parts (3 and 4), without direct contact between them, to form a finished assembly capable of receiving an optional additional element (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16B 12/46; F16B 12/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16B 12/46 (2006.01); F16B 12/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16B 12/48 (2013.01); F16B 12/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848181A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2762366 A1 19981023; FR 2762366 B1 19990709; EP 1036279 A1 20000920; WO 9848181 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATHIJSEN, VALERIE ELIANE PAULA

2002-11-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MATHIJSEN, VALERIE ELIANE PAULA

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2000-11-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES GB IT NL

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000210

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES GB IT NL