Global patent index - EP 1036296 A1

EP 1036296 A1 2000-09-20 - FLAT TUBE WITH TRANSVERSALLY OFFSET U-BEND SECTION AND HEAT EXCHANGER CONFIGURED USING SAME

Title (en)

FLAT TUBE WITH TRANSVERSALLY OFFSET U-BEND SECTION AND HEAT EXCHANGER CONFIGURED USING SAME

Title (de)

FLACHROHR MIT QUERVERSATZ-UMKEHRBOGENABSCHNITT UND DAMIT AUFGEBAUTER WÄRMEÜBERTRAGER

Title (fr)

TUBE PLAT AVEC UNE PARTIE COUDEE EN U, DECALEE TRANSVERSALEMENT, ET ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR CON U A PARTIR DE CE DERNIER

Publication

EP 1036296 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99945947 A

Priority

  • DE 9902125 W
  • DE 19830863 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19830863A1] The invention relates to a flat tube (1) with at least one U-bend section (3) in which the tube is bent such that its two flat tubular sections (2a, 2b), which are adjacent to the U-bend section, in their longitudinal direction have opposite directions of flow (4a, 4b) and longitudinal axes (5a, 5b) which are offset in relation to each other at least in the transverse direction (4). The flat tube transverse axis (7) forms an angle of no more than 45 DEG with a plane which is parallel to the longitudinal and transverse direction and vertical to a direction of stacking.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 1/02; F28D 1/047

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/047 (2006.01); F28F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/0478 (2013.01); F28D 1/0476 (2013.01); F28F 1/025 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0003190A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19830863 A1 20000113; AU 5849199 A 20000201; EP 1036296 A1 20000920; EP 1036296 B1 20040102; JP 2002520570 A 20020709; US 6546999 B1 20030415; WO 0003190 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060709

2006-07-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060709

2005-06-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050627

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-12-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-04-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040413

2004-04-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040402

2004-03-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT SE

2004-01-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040102

2004-01-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040102

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020313

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE