Global Patent Index - EP 1036350 A1

EP 1036350 A1 2000-09-20 - PENDULUM CLOCK AND METHOD FOR THE MODIFICATION OF A PENDULUM CLOCK

Title (en)

PENDULUM CLOCK AND METHOD FOR THE MODIFICATION OF A PENDULUM CLOCK

Title (de)

PENDELUHR UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERÄNDERUNG EINER PENDELUHR

Title (fr)

PENDULE A BALANCIER ET PROCEDE DE MODIFICATION ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 1036350 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905362 A

Priority

  • NL 9900073 W
  • NL 1008384 A
  • NL 1008595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942909A1] Method for modernizing a pendulum clock, by which the original character of the clock is maintained. For that purpose a control unit is added, together with a reference clock, a pneumatically driven cylinder and arresting means for arresting the pendulum. The pendulum clock is adjusted such that it runs slightly fast. Periodically, for example every hour, the pendulum is arrested up to the moment that the pendulum clock is in time with the reference clock. While the pendulum is arrested, the pendulum clock is wound up by the cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 1/08; G04C 9/00; G04B 1/02; G04B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 1/02 (2006.01); G04B 3/12 (2006.01); G04C 1/08 (2006.01); G04C 3/02 (2006.01); G04C 11/08 (2006.01); G04C 13/08 (2006.01); G04C 23/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04C 3/024 (2013.01); G04C 1/08 (2013.01); G04C 11/084 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942909 A1 19990826; AT 428132 T 20090415; AU 2551999 A 19990906; DE 69940689 D1 20090520; EP 1036350 A1 20000920; EP 1036350 B1 20090408; NL 1008595 A1 19980914; NL 1008595 C2 20000713

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120212

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120228

2012-12-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69940689

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120212

2012-09-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SPAANDER, MELGERT

- Effective date: 20120228

2011-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110412

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110217

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110302

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090408

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100111

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090408

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090719

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090908

2009-05-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69940689 P 20090520

2009-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2009-04-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071015

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991015

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT