Global Patent Index - EP 1036356 A4

EP 1036356 A4 2001-01-17 - METHOD OF RAPID PROTOTYPING FOR MULTIFACETED AND/OR FOLDED PATH LIGHTING SYSTEMS

Title (en)

METHOD OF RAPID PROTOTYPING FOR MULTIFACETED AND/OR FOLDED PATH LIGHTING SYSTEMS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM SCHNELLEN PROTOTYPENTWERFEN FÜR EIN VIELFACHFACETTIERTES UND/ODER MIT EINEM GEFALTENEM LICHTPFAD VERSEHENES BELLEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PHOTOTYPAGE RAPIDE POUR SYSTEMES D'ECLAIRAGE A FACETTES ET/OU A PLIS DE TRAJET

Publication

EP 1036356 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98939861 A

Priority

  • US 9815503 W
  • US 90089097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9905588A2] A method of rapid prototyping a lighting system which is at least one of folded path and multifaceted includes determining output power of the lighting system by calculating phase space density. A method of rapid prototyping a lighting system comprises ray tracing the lighting system, determining photometric quantities which describe the lighting system based on the ray tracing step, and providing a stereoscopic three-dimensional rendering of the lighting system based on the determining step. Advantageously, three-dimensional renderings promotes rapid prototyping by revealing any hidden pseudo-image artifacts in a lighting system before the lighting system is actually fabricated. A computer system for rapid prototyping a lighting system comprises a plurality of slave processors networked to a host processor. The slave processor and the master processor cooperate to ray trace the lighting system, and the slave processors perform substantially homogeneous independent tasks. Advantageously, the computer architecture allows the homogeneous independent tasks to be distributed to the plurality of slave computers, so that the overall amount of time required to perform the tasks is drastically reduced. Again, this promotes rapide prototyping by decreasing the amount of computational time required to generate useful information about a prototype lighting system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 8/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/0065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9905588A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9905588 A2 19990204; WO 9905588 A3 19990429; EP 1036356 A2 20000920; EP 1036356 A4 20010117; US 5995742 A 19991130

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-09-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHYSICAL OPTICS CORPORATION

2001-01-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 8/00 A

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB