Global patent index - EP 1036380 A1

EP 1036380 A1 2000-09-20 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GUARANTEED PURCHASING

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GUARANTEED PURCHASING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SICHERSTELLUNG BEI ANKÄUFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR L'ACHAT GARANTI

Publication

EP 1036380 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98949224 A

Priority

  • IL 9800501 W
  • IL 12246197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928873A1] A method for allowing buyers to make advance payments for the purchases of good and services at a Retail Business (RB), wherein said payment is guaranteed by a Guaranteeing Organization (GO) which provides a written guarantee issuable on the premises of said Retail Business, said method comprising the steps of: (a) establishing a credit by the GO for the RB, (b) providing within the GO means for storing, retrieving and updating information representative of the level of credit accorded to the RB by the GO; (c) providing communication means; (d) providing in the GO means for printing out at a remote printer a valid authenticated guarantee for the sum involved in said transaction; (e) checking whether the credit of the RB is sufficient to cover the requested guarantee; (f) preparing data required for issuing a guarantee to said customer; and (g) printing out said valid, authenticated guarantee at said remote printer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/10 (2006.01); G06Q 20/00 (2006.01); G06Q 30/00 (2006.01); G06Q 40/00 (2006.01); G06Q 50/00 (2006.01); G07F 17/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 20/02 (2013.01); G06Q 20/04 (2013.01); G06Q 20/28 (2013.01); G07F 17/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928873A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928873 A1 19990610; AU 9558598 A 19990616; CA 2300976 A1 19990610; DE 1036380 T1 20010315; EP 1036380 A1 20000920; IL 122461 A 19981206; IL 122461 D0 19980615; JP 2001525583 A 20011211

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20021130

2001-03-15 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001009

2000-11-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCAT

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE