Global Patent Index - EP 1036381 A1

EP 1036381 A1 2000-09-20 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONEY TRANSFERS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONEY TRANSFERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GELDÜBERTRAGUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRANSFERTS D'ARGENT

Publication

EP 1036381 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98955790 A

Priority

  • GB 9803537 W
  • GB 9725430 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2331822A] A money transfer system comprises remote terminals (10) for receiving transfer request information from a transferor (14). If the transferor is a new customer, a central server (12) generates a new party identifier code (PIC) using a secure postal printer (16), to send the PIC to the transferor independently of the communication with the terminal (10). The PIC will be re-used for subsequent transfers from the transferor. For each transaction, the server (12) allocates a unique transaction code (UTC) which is outputted to the transferor at the terminal (10). The server also generates money transfer instructions (22) communicated to the remote money handling authorities (28). The instructions include the existing or newly allocated PIC, and a verification code (TVC) related to the UTC, but insufficient to enable the UTC to be deduced therefrom. It is the transferor's responsibility to communicate the UTC and the PIC to the transferee (18), preferably by separate routes for security. If the parties have taken part in a previous transfer, then the transferee will already know the PIC from the previous transfer. The transferee can pick up the money from the bank upon presentation of the correct PIC and UTC matching the information in the money transfer instructions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 20/00 (2012.01); G07F 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/1008 (2013.01); G06Q 20/04 (2013.01); G06Q 20/10 (2013.01); G06Q 20/341 (2013.01); G06Q 20/385 (2013.01); G06Q 20/4093 (2013.01); G06Q 20/425 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

GB 2331822 A9; GB 2331822 A 19990602; GB 2331822 B 20020417; GB 9725430 D0 19980128; AU 1251599 A 19990616; AU 742367 B2 20020103; EP 1036381 A1 20000920; GB 0121971 D0 20011031; GB 2363664 A 20020102; GB 2363664 B 20020417; WO 9928872 A2 19990610; WO 9928872 A8 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-29 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1032281

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2006-03-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050909

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040408

2003-04-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STOCK TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL