Global Patent Index - EP 1036398 A1

EP 1036398 A1 2000-09-20 - ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES RELAIS

Title (fr)

RELAIS ELECTROMAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 1036398 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98959763 A

Priority

  • DE 9803151 W
  • DE 19753852 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19753852A1] The invention relates to an electromagnetic relay, comprising a magnetic system (6) with an exciting field coil (WR), a core and an armature. Each load current circuit can be closed by a movable contact element and by at least one fixed contact element. A reed contact (KR) is coupled to a load current conductor (1) in each load current circuit. Means to generate and process an overcurrent signal and to disconnect the control current are coupled to the reed contact (KR).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02H 3/08 (2006.01); H01H 45/04 (2006.01); H01H 47/32 (2006.01); H01H 50/04 (2006.01); H01H 50/14 (2006.01); H01H 71/00 (2006.01); H01H 71/24 (2006.01); H01H 50/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/2445 (2013.01); H01H 50/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930338A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19753852 A1 19990617; CA 2312486 A1 19990617; EP 1036398 A1 20000920; EP 1036398 B1 20020403; JP 2001526445 A 20011218; KR 20010032739 A 20010425; US 6600640 B1 20030729; WO 9930338 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051028

2005-10-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051028

2005-10-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051028

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-09-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040915

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031003

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-07-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803670 20020508

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT