Global Patent Index - EP 1036400 A1

EP 1036400 A1 2000-09-20 - SWITCHGEAR UNIT CONSISTING OF A SWITCHING DEVICE AND A COUPLED LEADING AUXILIARY SWITCH

Title (en)

SWITCHGEAR UNIT CONSISTING OF A SWITCHING DEVICE AND A COUPLED LEADING AUXILIARY SWITCH

Title (de)

SCHALTGERÄTEEINHEIT AUS EINEM SCHALTGERÄT UND ANGEKOPPELTEM VOREILENDEM HILFSSCHALTER

Title (fr)

UNITE APPAREIL DE COMMUTATION COMPRENANT UN APPAREIL DE COMMUTATION ET UN COMMUTATEUR AUXILIAIRE A AVANCE DE PHASE ACCOUPLE

Publication

EP 1036400 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963370 A

Priority

  • DE 9803451 W
  • DE 19754072 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930339A1] The invention relates to a switchgear unit comprising a switching device having a rotating drive (12) and a switch latch and a leading auxiliary switch (1) coupled thereto. The switching device has a gate guide (15) that cooperates with a spigot (15) on the contact bridge support of the auxiliary switch (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/46; H01H 83/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/46 (2006.01); H01H 83/12 (2006.01); H01H 71/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/12 (2013.01); H01H 71/462 (2013.01); H01H 71/56 (2013.01); H01H 2071/565 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930339A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930339 A1 19990617; CN 1169178 C 20040929; CN 1281582 A 20010124; DE 19754072 C1 19990722; EP 1036400 A1 20000920; EP 1036400 B1 20020206; US 6326871 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-01-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803039

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-21

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT