Global Patent Index - EP 1036401 A1

EP 1036401 A1 2000-09-20 - SWITCHGEAR UNIT WITH LEADING AUXILIARY SWITCH

Title (en)

SWITCHGEAR UNIT WITH LEADING AUXILIARY SWITCH

Title (de)

SCHALTGERÄTEEINHEIT MIT VOREILENDEM HILFSSCHALTER

Title (fr)

UNITE APPAREIL DE COMMUTATION AVEC COMMUTATEUR AUXILIAIRE A AVANCE DE PHASE

Publication

EP 1036401 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963371 A

Priority

  • DE 9803452 W
  • DE 19754071 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930340A1] The auxiliary switch (2) has a slide (5) with a gate (14) as an actuating element that engages with the reversing lever (13) acting upon the contact carrier (11). After a first actuation stage, in which the slide (5) pushes the contact carrier (11) into the ON position, the actuating element of a basic switching device (1) is actuated when pushing is continued.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/46; H01H 83/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/46 (2006.01); H01H 83/12 (2006.01); H01H 71/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/462 (2013.01); H01H 83/12 (2013.01); H01H 71/54 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930340A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930340 A1 19990617; CN 1169179 C 20040929; CN 1281583 A 20010124; DE 19754071 C1 19990715; EP 1036401 A1 20000920; EP 1036401 B1 20020206; US 6359244 B1 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-01-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803040 20020321

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT