Global Patent Index - EP 1036484 A1

EP 1036484 A1 2000-09-20 - RESONANT MODE PANEL-LOUDSPEAKERS

Title (en)

RESONANT MODE PANEL-LOUDSPEAKERS

Title (de)

RESONANZ-WELLENTYP PANEELLAUTSPRECHER

Title (fr)

HAUT-PARLEURS DU TYPE PANNEAU A MODE RESONNANT

Publication

EP 1036484 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98949102 A

Priority

  • GB 9803131 W
  • GB 9722079 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9921397A1] A resonant panel-form loudspeaker characterised by suspension means located in at least one panel region of low average velocity. A method of making a resonant panel acoustic device characterised by locating at least one panel region of low average velocity and positioning suspension means within the said region(s). The method may comprise delineating an acoustically active area of a larger panel, e.g. a motor vehicle decorative trim panel, by grooving or slotting the panel in panel regions of low average velocity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 7/06; H04R 7/04; H04R 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/06 (2006.01); H04R 1/02 (2006.01); H04R 7/04 (2006.01); H04R 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 7/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9921397A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9921397 A1 19990429; AT 266301 T 20040515; AU 9548498 A 19990510; BR 9812949 A 20000808; CA 2303789 A1 19990429; CN 1271508 A 20001025; DE 69823695 D1 20040609; EP 1036484 A1 20000920; EP 1036484 B1 20040506; GB 9722079 D0 19971217; HK 1027251 A1 20040903; IL 135677 D0 20010520; JP 2001521353 A 20011106; TW 410526 B 20001101

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091016

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041006

2005-07-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-04-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-10-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041018

2004-09-03 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1027251

2004-08-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040817

2004-08-07 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040807

2004-08-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-08-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69823695 P 20040609

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

2004-05-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04R 7/06 A

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04R 9/06 B

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04R 7/04 B

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL PT SE