Global Patent Index - EP 1036513 A1

EP 1036513 A1 2000-09-20 - Skate, in particular in-line skate, for "agressive" skating

Title (en)

Skate, in particular in-line skate, for "agressive" skating

Title (de)

Rollschuh, insbesondere Einspurrollschuh, für "agressives" Skating

Title (fr)

Patin, notamment à roues en ligne, pour un patinage "aggressive"

Publication

EP 1036513 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00104913 A

Priority

FR 9903492 A

Abstract (en)

The skate comprises a boot (2) which is fixed on the plate (4) of a chassis (5) supporting the blades (6). The boot comprises a supple upper (7) which is fitted on a rigid sole (3). A rigid support (8) receiving the upper forms a monobloc shell which is cut out in its front and side part corresponding to the top of the foot and defines the sole. A heel stiffener (10) rises from the sole and receives a rigid articulated collar (11) and a protection band (12) extending from the heel stiffener borders the front and the sides of the sole.

Abstract (fr)

Patin (1) comprenant une partie chaussante (2) destinée à être fixée sur la platine (4) d'un châssis (5) supportant l'élément de glisse (6), pour la pratique d'un patinage dit "agressive", caractérisé en ce que la chaussure comporte : une partie souple formant une tige (7) haute ou basse, montée sur une semelle rigide dite première de montage (9), un berceau rigide (8) destiné à recevoir la partie souple (7) et formant une coque monobloc découpée à sa partie avant et latérale correspondant au-dessus du pied et définissant une semelle (3) destinée à la fixation sur le châssis (5), à partir de laquelle s'élève d'une part un contrefort talon (10) susceptible de recevoir un collier rigide articulé (11) et d'autre part un bandeau de protection (12) bordant périphériquement l'avant et les côtés de la semelle (3) en prolongement du contrefort talon (10), des moyens d'assemblage de la partie souple (7) sur le berceau rigide (8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/16; A63C 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/16 (2006.01); A63C 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/1641 (2013.01); A63C 17/06 (2013.01); A63C 2201/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2766065 A1 19990122 - SALOMON SA [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036513 A1 20000920; FR 2790970 A1 20000922; FR 2790970 B1 20011102; US 6340164 B1 20020122

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040525

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030604

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010316

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI