Global Patent Index - EP 1036522 A3

EP 1036522 A3 2001-01-17 - Hair brush or comb with suction

Title (en)

Hair brush or comb with suction

Title (de)

Haarbürste oder Kamm mit Saugwirkung

Title (fr)

Brosse à cheveux ou tondeuse aspirante

Publication

EP 1036522 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00200753 A

Priority

GB 9905673 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1036522A2] A hair brush for removing headlice, dandruff or the like from the hair comprising a body having at least one row of bristles, an aperture adjacent to the teeth or bristles, a passageway through the body from the aperture and a connector to a suction source. Normally the suction source will be a domestic vacuum cleaner. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 15/00; A45D 24/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036522 A2 20000920; EP 1036522 A3 20010117; GB 2347857 A 20000920; GB 9905673 D0 19990505

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 46B 15/00 A, 7A 45D 24/32 B

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI