Global Patent Index - EP 1036525 A1

EP 1036525 A1 2000-09-20 - Improvements in wine barrel racks

Title (en)

Improvements in wine barrel racks

Title (de)

Verbesserungen zu Lagerung von Weinfässergebinden

Title (fr)

Améliorations aux rayonnages pour des tonneaux de vin

Publication

EP 1036525 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99500215 A

Priority

EP 99500215 A

Abstract (en)

Starting from a rack where a rectangular base structure (1), preferably metal, equipped with seating for a pair of barrels (2). A base structure fitted to on the apices of its posts (3) acting as separators for the piling up between racks and consequently, for the piling up of barrels. The improvements consist of establishing a seating for each barrel (2), a set of four wheels (7), assembled with free rotation on short arms (6) fitted to the base structure (1), in such a way the said set of wheels determines perfect stability for the respective barrel (2), yet, allowing rotation of the said barrel (2) on its own axis, to facilitate its mobility during barrel control manoeuvres, decanting of its contents or cleaning of the same. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 81/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 81/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 81/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036525 A1 20000920; EP 1036525 B1 20030402; DE 69906473 D1 20030508; DE 69906473 T2 20040108; ES 2149749 T1 20001116; ES 2149749 T3 20031101; PT 1036525 E 20030731

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69906473

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161108

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161117

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20151112

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-11-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149749 T3

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906473 P 20030508

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020521

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT PT

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-11-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149749 T1

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI