Global Patent Index - EP 1036526 A1

EP 1036526 A1 2000-09-20 - Device for stabilising the running behaviour of a drawer moving in a furniture casing

Title (en)

Device for stabilising the running behaviour of a drawer moving in a furniture casing

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Stabilisierung des Laufverhaltens einer in einem M-belkorpus verfahrbaren Schublade

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la stabilisation du comportement d'un tiroir déplaçable dans un corps de meuble

Publication

EP 1036526 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104058 A

Priority

  • AT 47399 A
  • AT 152399 A

Abstract (en)

The device for stabilising the motion in the carcass of a piece of furniture of a drawer fitted with pinions which cooperate with racks (5) on each side comprises a correcting area (24) on at least one rack in which the teeth are lower than they are on teeth (17) in the rest of the rack.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zur Stabilisierung des Laufverhaltens einer in einem Möbelkorpus verfahrbaren Schublade (3). An beiden Seiten der Schublade (3) ist ein Zahnrad (10) gelagert. Die beiden Zahnräder (10) sind drehfest miteinander verbunden und kämmen mit korpusseitigen Zahnstangen (5). An jeder Zahnstange (5) ist ein an das hintere Ende der Zahnreihe anschließender durch das Zahnrad (10) bewegbarer Zahn (18) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/04; A47B 88/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/04 (2006.01); A47B 88/10 (2006.01); A47B 88/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/40 (2017.01); A47B 2210/0078 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 2214291 A 19400910 - ROY WYCKOFF WILLIAM LE

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036526 A1 20000920; EP 1036526 B1 20050824; AT 302558 T 20050915; AT 6674 U2 20040225; AT 6674 U3 20041227; DE 50011002 D1 20050929; EP 1574151 A2 20050914; EP 1574151 A3 20060816; EP 1574151 B1 20131106; ES 2244369 T3 20051216; ES 2445162 T3 20140228

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 50011002

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A47B0088040000

- IPC: A47B0088400000

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160502

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-08-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060526

2005-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2244369 T3

2005-09-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011002 P 20050929

2005-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2005-08-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JULIUS BLUM GMBH

2005-08-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GASSER, INGO

2005-08-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOFHERR, HARALD

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020913

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES IT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI