Global Patent Index - EP 1036533 A2

EP 1036533 A2 2000-09-20 - Support for bathtub or shower tray

Title (en)

Support for bathtub or shower tray

Title (de)

Wannenträger für eine Bade- oder Duschwanne.

Title (fr)

Support de baignoire ou de bac de douche

Publication

EP 1036533 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104119 A

Priority

DE 19911343 A

Abstract (en)

The bath or shower housing consists of foam panels (11) with metal mounting devices (15, 16) fixed to them. The bath feet (12, 13, 14) are inserted into these.

Abstract (de)

Bei dieser Erfindung handelt es sich um einen Wannenträger für eine Bade- oder Duschwanne. Der Wannenträger umfasst eine ein- oder mehrstückige Wannenauflage aus Schaumstoffmaterial, in die eine Bade- oder Duschwanne einsetzbar ist und eine Mehrzahl von Füßen, wobei für jeden Fuß eine aus Metall gebildete Lagerung vorgesehen ist, die fest mit der Wannenauflage verbunden ist und daß die Füße in der aus Metall gebildeten Lagerung gehalten sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/1605 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036533 A2 20000920; EP 1036533 A3 20010912; DE 19911343 A1 20000928; DE 19911343 C2 20010628

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051130

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020215

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI