Global Patent Index - EP 1036536 A2

EP 1036536 A2 2000-09-20 - Suction device for cleaning purposes

Title (en)

Suction device for cleaning purposes

Title (de)

Schmutzsauger zur Reinigungszwecken

Title (fr)

Aspirateur à des fins de nettoyage

Publication

EP 1036536 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105237 A

Priority

DE 19911226 A

Abstract (en)

The cleaner has a dirt container (1), through which a suction stream is passed. Dirt passes through at least one filter unit and is collected in the dirt container. The dirt container is covered by removable coarse filter holder (5), which is arranged symmetrically about a central handle (2). The handle can be removed by screws (3).

Abstract (de)

Zur vereinfachten, kompakten Bauweise eines Schmutzsauger zu Reinigungszwecken, mit einem Schmutzbehälter (1), durch den ein Saugstrom geführt wird, wobei Schmutz durch wenigstens eine Filtereinrichtung in den Schmutzbehälter (1) abgesondert wird, wird vorgeschlagen, daß der Schmutzbehälter (1) von einem lösbaren Grobfilter-Träger (4) abgedeckt ist, wobei insbesondere auch die Verschmutzung von nachgeschalteten Feinfiltern weitgehend vermieden wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 7/00 (2006.01); A47L 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/122 (2013.01); A47L 7/0038 (2013.01); A47L 7/0042 (2013.01); A47L 9/1409 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19911226 A1 20000914; EP 1036536 A2 20000920; EP 1036536 A3 20020605

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070717

2007-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051129

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021204

2003-02-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47L 9/10 A, 7A 47L 5/36 B, 7A 47L 9/12 B

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI