Global Patent Index - EP 1036571 A2

EP 1036571 A2 2000-09-20 - Cannula for medical access ports

Title (en)

Cannula for medical access ports

Title (de)

Kanüle für medizinischen Zugangsports

Title (fr)

Canule pour un port d'accès médical

Publication

EP 1036571 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105484 A

Priority

DE 19911970 A

Abstract (en)

Cannular for medical entry ports comprises a closed, substantially conical tip (14) and at least one longitudinal slit (20) which is located in the side wall of the cannula adjacent to the front end section (12), and serves for fluid delivery.

Abstract (de)

Eine Kanüle für Ports umfaßt einen hohlen Schaft, eine am ersten, vorderen Ende des Portkanüle ausgebildete Spitze und einen am zweiten, hinteren Ende der Portkanüle vorgesehenen Fluidanschluß, wobei im Bereich des ersten Endes zumindest eine Fluiddurchtrittsöffnung in der Wandung des Schaftes vorgesehen ist. Die Spitze ist im wesentlichen kegelförmig und geschlossen ausgebildet und die zumindest eine Fluiddurchtrittsöffnung ist von einem Längsschlitz in der seitlichen Wandung des Schaftes, dem ersten Ende benachbart, gebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 39/02; A61M 5/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/32 (2006.01); A61M 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/3286 (2013.01); A61M 5/3291 (2013.01); A61M 39/0208 (2013.01); A61M 2209/045 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 8014762 U1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036571 A2 20000920; EP 1036571 A3 20030502; DE 19911970 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031001

2004-02-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI