Global Patent Index - EP 1036583 A2

EP 1036583 A2 2000-09-20 - Two spinning handle top

Title (en)

Two spinning handle top

Title (de)

Spielzeugkreisel mit zwei Handgriffen

Title (fr)

Toupie comportant deux poignées

Publication

EP 1036583 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00104579 A

Priority

IL 12898799 A

Abstract (en)

A two spinning handle top, which both its handles may be used as spinning handles. The two spinning handle top is made of curved material and is balanced on a central point to form a shape. The two spinning handle top height is no less then 1.5 centimeters and no more than 100 centimeters, and the top's circle is symmetrical. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036583 A2 20000920; EP 1036583 A3 20030416; IL 128987 A 20040831; IL 128987 D0 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI