Global patent index - EP 1036594 A3

EP 1036594 A3 2001-01-24 - Multichannel droplet generator

Title (en)

Multichannel droplet generator

Title (de)

Mehrkanal-Tropfengenerator

Title (fr)

Générateur multicanaux de gouttelettes

Publication

EP 1036594 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00104462 A

Priority

DE 19911456 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1036594A2] Tubular shaped outlets (4) are present on the outlets (13), whose cross-section is smaller than the cross-section of the channels in the distributor (3) and whose length and cross-section are coordinated with the elasticity length and cross-section elastic connection (2) and conveying speed of the dosing arrangement (1). The multichannel-drop generator has a dynamic behavior which leads to a contact-free liquid removal and a subsequent complete emptying of the outlet (4). Multichannel-drop generator has a dosing arrangement (1), distributor (3) having an inlet (12) and several outlets (13), and an elastic connector (2) that connects the dosing arrangement (1) with the inlet (12). The inlet (12) is connected to the outlets (13) via a planar channel system made up of cascading T-pieces, which leads to a homogenous pressure distribution.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01L 3/02; B01L 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 31/16 (2006.01); B01J 4/02 (2006.01); B01L 3/02 (2006.01); G01N 1/00 (2006.01); G01N 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/0268 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0864 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0487 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19911456 A1 20000914; EP 1036594 A2 20000920; EP 1036594 A3 20010124; EP 1036594 B1 20050615; JP 2000258438 A 20000922

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160307

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2006-08-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-08-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060811

2006-06-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060316

2005-10-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050926

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50010538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-07-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CYBIO AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 01L 3/02 A, 7B 01L 11/00 B

2000-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CYBIO INSTRUMENTS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI