Global Patent Index - EP 1036610 A1

EP 1036610 A1 2000-09-20 - Investment and mould casting in carbon and organic aerogels

Title (en)

Investment and mould casting in carbon and organic aerogels

Title (de)

Fein- und Formguss in Kunststoff/Kohlenstoffaerogelen

Title (fr)

Moulage de précision et en châssis dans des aérogels organiques ou en carbone

Publication

EP 1036610 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104214 A

Priority

DE 19911847 A

Abstract (en)

Open-pored aerogel mold material is obtained by sol-gel polymerization e.g., resorcinol/formaldehyde with a polymerization catalyst such as ammonium or sodium carbonate, followed by complete or partial pyrolysis of the resultant aerogel. Fillers, e.g. aluminum oxide, titanium oxide, quartz, polystyrene particles, carbon or silicon carbide fibers can be added. Independent claims are also included for the following precision casting processes for metals or alloys: (a) a wax mold is coated with a sol of suitable composition and a catalyst and converted to a gel at a temperature below the melting point of the wax. The process is repeated to build up the mold, after which the gel is dried. The temperature is then raised to melt or burn out the wax; (b) a wax pattern is placed in a container which is then filled with the synthetic sol and heated to below the wax melting point. The resultant gel is dried and the temperature raised to melt or burn out the wax.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Formstoff für den Fein- und Formguss von Metallen oder Metall-Legierungen umfassend Kunststoff- und/oder Kohlenstoffaerogete sowie ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von entsprechenden Formstoffen. Der Formstoff umfasst hochporöse, offenporige Kunststoff- und/oder Kohlenstoffaerogele, erhältlich durch Sol-Gel-Polymerisation von organischen Kunststoffmaterialien gegebenenfalls gefolgt von teilweise oder vollständiger Pyrolyse des erhaltenen Kunststoffaerogels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 1/00; B22C 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 1/00 (2006.01); B22C 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 1/165 (2013.01); B22C 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] DE 19738466 C1 19981224 - DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]
  • [Y] DE 19721600 A1 19981126 - HOECHST AG [DE]
  • [Y] US 4873218 A 19891010 - PEKALA RICHARD W [US]
  • [PY] TSCHEUSCHNER D ET AL: "Investment casting in silica aerogels", MATERIAL SCIENCE FORUM, vol. 329-330, 2000, pages 479 - 486, XP000925267
  • [A] ALLKEMPER J ET AL: "Chill casting into aerogels", SCRIPTA METALLURGICA ET MATERIALIA, vol. 29, 1993, pages 1495 - 1500, XP000925332
  • [A] HRUBESH L W: "Aerogel applications", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS,NL,NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY, AMSTERDAM, vol. 225, no. 1-3, 15 April 1998 (1998-04-15), pages 335 - 342, XP004178562, ISSN: 0022-3093
  • [A] FRICKE J ET AL: "Aerogels: production, characterization, and applications", THIN SOLID FILMS,CH,ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, vol. 297, no. 1-2, 1 April 1997 (1997-04-01), pages 212 - 223, XP004125997, ISSN: 0040-6090

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036610 A1 20000920; EP 1036610 B1 20050831; AT 303214 T 20050915; DE 19911847 A1 20000928; DE 50011046 D1 20051006; US 2003212152 A1 20031113; US 6599953 B1 20030729; US 6887915 B2 20050503

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2006-08-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DEUTSCHES ZENTRUM FUER LUFT- UND RAUMFAHRT E.V.

- Free text: DEUTSCHES ZENTRUM FUER LUFT- UND RAUMFAHRT E.V.# #53175 BONN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DEUTSCHES ZENTRUM FUER LUFT- UND RAUMFAHRT E.V.#LINDER HOEHE#51147 KOELN (DE)

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-06-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DEUTSCHES ZENTRUM FUER LUFT- UND RAUMFAHRT E.V.

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051024

2005-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG

2005-10-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011046 P 20051006

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041014

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI